THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:36:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Gorakhpur University, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, MARATHI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeridge Health
Department of Pediatrics
1 Hospital Crt
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2101-222 Kings St. East
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 1P6
Phone: 9056979770
Fax: 9056976452

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 17 Sep 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. V. Kukreti and Dr. D. Mankad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Apr 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, MARATHI, URDU
Medical School: Gorakhpur University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeridge Health
Department of Pediatrics
1 Hospital Crt
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2101-222 Kings St. East
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 1P6
Phone: 9056979770
Fax: 9056976452

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 17 Sep 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. V. Kukreti and Dr. D. Mankad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Apr 2021

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
06 Dec 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 06 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. VINAY KUKRETI may practise medicine independently in pediatrics.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. VINAY KUKRETI may practise medicine independently in pediatrics.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Gorakhpur University, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 06 Dec 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Aug 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 09 Mar 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 Aug 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 23 Aug 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 16 Jul 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 06 Dec 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2027

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Oct 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Sep 2009