THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:57:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Univerzita Komenskeho,Bratislava, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CZECH, HUNGARIAN, RUSSIAN, SLOVAK

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: B-6 Harvey St
Chatham ON N7M 1L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 18889306571
Fax: 18559672945

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Dec 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 14 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. Patasi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Oct 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CZECH, HUNGARIAN, RUSSIAN, SLOVAK
Medical School: Univerzita Komenskeho,Bratislava, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: B-6 Harvey St
Chatham ON N7M 1L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 18889306571
Fax: 18559672945

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Dec 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 14 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. Patasi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Oct 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BEATA PATASI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATASI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BEATA PATASI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATASI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Univerzita Komenskeho,Bratislava, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Nov 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Feb 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Nov 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Feb 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2009