THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:38:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 77 Dunfield Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4S 2H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164818524
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Unit 23 Suite 210
1077 North Service Rd
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 1A6
Phone: (905) 273-9009
Fax: 9052736409
Address: 155 BALMORAL AVENUE
Toronto Ontario M4V 1J5
Phone: 416 927 0055
Fax: 416 927 0925

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 77 Dunfield Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4S 2H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164818524
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Unit 23 Suite 210
1077 North Service Rd
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 1A6
Phone: (905) 273-9009
Fax: 9052736409
Address: 155 BALMORAL AVENUE
Toronto Ontario M4V 1J5
Phone: 416 927 0055
Fax: 416 927 0925

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VICTORIA MARIE SINCLAIR SMART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMART is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VICTORIA MARIE SINCLAIR SMART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMART is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Dec 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Feb 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2009