THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:47:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tanta University, 1983
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-726 Upper Gage Ave
Hamilton ON L8V 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-481-3242
Fax: 365-317-8029

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: HALA N. AKLADIOS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Akladios (CPSO#: 92254 )
Business Address: 2181 Highcliffe Way
Oakville Ontario L6M 5B7
6479676732

Corporation Name: Hala N. Akladios Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Oct 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Tanta University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-726 Upper Gage Ave
Hamilton ON L8V 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-481-3242
Fax: 365-317-8029

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: HALA N. AKLADIOS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Akladios (CPSO#: 92254 )
Business Address: 2181 Highcliffe Way
Oakville Ontario L6M 5B7
6479676732

Corporation Name: Hala N. Akladios Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Oct 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HALA NAZMY AKLADIOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKLADIOS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HALA NAZMY AKLADIOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKLADIOS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tanta University, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2009
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Apr 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Apr 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Feb 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Nov 2009