THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:46:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3420 rebecca street
unite 6, 7
Oakville Ontario L6L 6W2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 847-2525
Fax: 9058474447

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rehab Saad Eldin Omar Heikal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Heikal (CPSO#: 92266 )
Business Address: 3420 Rebecca Street
Oakville Ontario L6L 6W2
9058472525

Corporation Name: Dr. Rehab Saad Eldin Omar Heikal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Aug 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3420 rebecca street
unite 6, 7
Oakville Ontario L6L 6W2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 847-2525
Fax: 9058474447

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rehab Saad Eldin Omar Heikal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Heikal (CPSO#: 92266 )
Business Address: 3420 Rebecca Street
Oakville Ontario L6L 6W2
9058472525

Corporation Name: Dr. Rehab Saad Eldin Omar Heikal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Aug 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REHAB SAAD ELDIN OMAR HEIKAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEIKAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REHAB SAAD ELDIN OMAR HEIKAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEIKAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2009
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Nov 2009