THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/04/25 04:34:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 18 Oct 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 18 Oct 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2004
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Rheumatology
01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Rheumatology
01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Rheumatology
24 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
University of Toronto
EL - Pediatric Rheumatology
04 Jan 2010 to 12 Feb 2010
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Rheumatology
DATE: 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Rheumatology
DATE: 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Rheumatology
DATE: 24 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Pediatric Rheumatology
DATE: 04 Jan 2010 to 12 Feb 2010
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Feb 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2010
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 2010