THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/04/25 03:29:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 45 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 301
Toronto Ontario M2N 5N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-223-5460
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nuclear Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nuclear Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - Northwest Territories
Canada - Nunavut
Canada - Saskatchewan
Canada - Yukon Territory

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 45 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 301
Toronto Ontario M2N 5N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-223-5460
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nuclear Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nuclear Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - Northwest Territories
Canada - Nunavut
Canada - Saskatchewan
Canada - Yukon Territory

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMAR AVINASH SUCHAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUCHAK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMAR AVINASH SUCHAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUCHAK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2025
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 09 Aug 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 2025

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jan 2010