THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:09:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1991
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
27 Jan 2010 to 20 Apr 2010
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
DATE: 27 Jan 2010 to 20 Apr 2010
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2010
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Apr 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jan 2010