THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:37:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Mississippi, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 254-1661
Extension: 52226
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4444
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1453 Prince Road
Windsor Ontario N9C 3Z4
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rob Seski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Mississippi, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 254-1661
Extension: 52226
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4444
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1453 Prince Road
Windsor Ontario N9C 3Z4
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rob Seski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
09 Sep 2020
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 09 2020
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ROBERT CHARLES SESKI may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.


VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ROBERT CHARLES SESKI may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.


Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Mississippi, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 09 Sep 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 Sep 2018
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 07 Dec 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 09 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 14 Mar 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 09 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2018

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 07 Dec 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2012

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2011

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2010