THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 05:06:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: United Arab Emirates University College of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: United Arab Emirates University College of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: United Arab Emirates University College of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2005
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2023 to 31 Jul 2023
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
23 Sep 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2022 to 22 Sep 2022
University of Toronto
EL - Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
15 Mar 2010 to 05 Apr 2010
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 31 Jul 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 23 Sep 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 22 Sep 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
DATE: 15 Mar 2010 to 05 Apr 2010
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 Apr 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2010
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 Apr 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 2010