THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/04/25 11:38:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Christian Medical College, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Christian Medical College, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Christian Medical College, 2002
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
01 Apr 2014 to 27 Jun 2014
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
26 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
University of Ottawa
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
01 Jul 2010 to 25 Aug 2010
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 01 Apr 2014 to 27 Jun 2014
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 26 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2010 to 25 Aug 2010
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 27 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010