THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:43:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2007
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
University of Toronto
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
31 May 2010 to 25 Jun 2010
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 31 May 2010 to 25 Jun 2010
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 25 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 May 2010
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 May 2010