THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 02:46:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 602B
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9059537917
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 03 Oct 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 May 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 03 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 03 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Humayun Nuri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Oct 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 602B
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9059537917
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 03 Oct 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 May 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 03 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 03 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Humayun Nuri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Oct 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HUMAYUN NURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NURI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HUMAYUN NURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NURI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Feb 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jun 2010