THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:32:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 770 Broadview Avenue
Unit 105
Ottawa
Ottawa Ontario K2A 3Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 680-9092
Fax: (613) 680-9093
Address: Queensway Carleton Hospital
Dept. of Medicine, Hospitalist Div.
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Extension: 4842
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Holyoke Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Mar 2024

Corporation Name: J. Holyoke Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Oct 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 770 Broadview Avenue
Unit 105
Ottawa
Ottawa Ontario K2A 3Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 680-9092
Fax: (613) 680-9093
Address: Queensway Carleton Hospital
Dept. of Medicine, Hospitalist Div.
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Extension: 4842
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Holyoke Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Mar 2024

Corporation Name: J. Holyoke Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Oct 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER ROSA HOLYOKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLYOKE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER ROSA HOLYOKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLYOKE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010