THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:39:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: Villani, Daniela Frances (Used Until: 15 May 2011)
Medical School: McMaster University, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9600 Bathurst Street, 3rd floor,
suite 300
Vaughan Ontario L6A 3Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 269-1522
Fax: (905) 303-9773

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Costantini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Jul 2022

General Information

Former Name: Villani, Daniela Frances (Used Until: 15 May 2011)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN
Medical School: McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9600 Bathurst Street, 3rd floor,
suite 300
Vaughan Ontario L6A 3Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 269-1522
Fax: (905) 303-9773

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Costantini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Jul 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIELA FRANCES COSTANTINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COSTANTINI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIELA FRANCES COSTANTINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COSTANTINI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jan 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010