THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:34:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Medicine
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 721-4842
Fax: (613) 721-4785
Address: 29-1910 Saint Laurent Boulevard
Ottawa Gastrointestinal Institute
Ottawa Ontario K1G 1A4
Phone: 613-686-6656
Fax: 613-248-9009

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Jul 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 31 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Carleton Place

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Medicine
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 721-4842
Fax: (613) 721-4785
Address: 29-1910 Saint Laurent Boulevard
Ottawa Gastrointestinal Institute
Ottawa Ontario K1G 1A4
Phone: 613-686-6656
Fax: 613-248-9009

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Jul 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 31 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Carleton Place

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASON JOHN KISER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KISER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASON JOHN KISER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KISER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 25 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2010