THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:02:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: Paraghamian, Armen (Used Until: 19 Nov 2014)
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 20 Oct 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 20 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Armen Parajian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Sep 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Parajian (CPSO#: 92997 )

General Information

Former Name: Paraghamian, Armen (Used Until: 19 Nov 2014)
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 20 Oct 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 20 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Armen Parajian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Sep 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Parajian (CPSO#: 92997 )

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Proceeding Type: Discipline referral to OPSDT
Date of Decision: 27 Mar 2025
Summary of Decision:
On March 27, 2025, the Tribunal found that Dr. Parajian, committed professional misconduct, having been found guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability to practise. On December 22, 2021, following a guilty plea in the Ontario Court of Justice, Dr. Parajian was convicted of criminal harassment. The conviction involved thirteen female victims (twelve minors between the ages of 10 and 15 and one adult), contrary to ss. 264(1) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Further, on or about May 17, 2021, while Dr. Parajian was inside his parked vehicle on a residential street during the day, he masturbated himself while members of the public were in proximity to his vehicle, including an adult and two minors.

The Tribunal found that the above-described acts would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
 
The Tribunal ordered that: 
  1.  Dr. Parajian attend before the panel to be reprimanded; 
  2. the Registrar revoke Dr. Parajian’s certificate of registration certificate of registration effective March 28, 2025 at 12:01 a.m.; and
  3. Dr. Parajian pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 by April 28, 2025.
The panel’s reasons for decision will be released shortly. OPSDT reasons are also available at www.opsdt.ca and https://www.canlii.org/en/on/onpsdt/. The exhibits, including the Agreed Statement of Facts, can be obtained by contacting the Tribunal Office at [email protected]
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
For more details please visit the OPSDT website

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Other
Effective Date: 22 Dec 2021
Summary:
Findings of Guilt

Armen Parajian was found guilty of the following offence:

1. Criminal harassment, contrary to section 264(2)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date: December 22, 2021

SENTENCE: Suspended sentence with 3 years’ probation;

Probation conditions:
1. Keep the peace and be of good behaviour;
2. Appear before the court when required to do so by the court;
3. Notify the court or the probation officer in advance of any change of name or address and promptly notify the court or probation officer of any change in employment or occupation;
4. Report to a probation officer by phone within 48 hours and for the first 12 months thereafter as directed by their probation officer;
5. Cooperate with their probation officer, including signing any releases necessary for the probation officer to monitor compliance, and provide proof of compliance with any condition of the order to the probation officer upon request;
6. Attend any assessment, treatment, counselling as recommended by the probation officer;
7. Not to contact or communicate directly or indirectly with a list of individuals whose names are subject to a publication ban;
8. Not to attend within the boundaries of named streets, as the sole occupant of vehicle. 
 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Proceeding Type: Discipline referral to OPSDT
Date of Decision: 27 Mar 2025
Summary of Decision:
On March 27, 2025, the Tribunal found that Dr. Parajian, committed professional misconduct, having been found guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability to practise. On December 22, 2021, following a guilty plea in the Ontario Court of Justice, Dr. Parajian was convicted of criminal harassment. The conviction involved thirteen female victims (twelve minors between the ages of 10 and 15 and one adult), contrary to ss. 264(1) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Further, on or about May 17, 2021, while Dr. Parajian was inside his parked vehicle on a residential street during the day, he masturbated himself while members of the public were in proximity to his vehicle, including an adult and two minors.

The Tribunal found that the above-described acts would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
 
The Tribunal ordered that: 
  1.  Dr. Parajian attend before the panel to be reprimanded; 
  2. the Registrar revoke Dr. Parajian’s certificate of registration certificate of registration effective March 28, 2025 at 12:01 a.m.; and
  3. Dr. Parajian pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 by April 28, 2025.
The panel’s reasons for decision will be released shortly. OPSDT reasons are also available at www.opsdt.ca and https://www.canlii.org/en/on/onpsdt/. The exhibits, including the Agreed Statement of Facts, can be obtained by contacting the Tribunal Office at [email protected]
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
For more details please visit the OPSDT website

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Other
Effective Date: 22 Dec 2021
Summary:
Findings of Guilt

Armen Parajian was found guilty of the following offence:

1. Criminal harassment, contrary to section 264(2)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date: December 22, 2021

SENTENCE: Suspended sentence with 3 years’ probation;

Probation conditions:
1. Keep the peace and be of good behaviour;
2. Appear before the court when required to do so by the court;
3. Notify the court or the probation officer in advance of any change of name or address and promptly notify the court or probation officer of any change in employment or occupation;
4. Report to a probation officer by phone within 48 hours and for the first 12 months thereafter as directed by their probation officer;
5. Cooperate with their probation officer, including signing any releases necessary for the probation officer to monitor compliance, and provide proof of compliance with any condition of the order to the probation officer upon request;
6. Attend any assessment, treatment, counselling as recommended by the probation officer;
7. Not to contact or communicate directly or indirectly with a list of individuals whose names are subject to a publication ban;
8. Not to attend within the boundaries of named streets, as the sole occupant of vehicle. 
 

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Revocation by Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal. Effective: 28 Mar 2025
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Revocation by Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal.
Date: Effective: 28 Mar 2025

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 May 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010