THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:58:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Science Centre
Department of Pediatrics
800 Commissioners Rd E
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8500
Extension: 58824
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 09 Nov 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 09 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Science Centre
Department of Pediatrics
800 Commissioners Rd E
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8500
Extension: 58824
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 09 Nov 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 09 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TARA LYNN MULLOWNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MULLOWNEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TARA LYNN MULLOWNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MULLOWNEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 May 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010