THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 04:31:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad Iberoamericana(UNIBE), 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, SPANISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Carling Height Family Health Centre
124 Barker Street
London Ontario N5Y 1Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519204 2775
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 70 MEREDITH STREET
Gore Bay Ontario P0P 1H0
Phone: 705-282-2262
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2 Water Street
Kirkland & District Family Health Team
Kirkland Lake ON P2N 3M6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Dec 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Zealand

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. K. Bali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Jul 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, SPANISH, URDU
Medical School: Universidad Iberoamericana(UNIBE), 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Carling Height Family Health Centre
124 Barker Street
London Ontario N5Y 1Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519204 2775
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 70 MEREDITH STREET
Gore Bay Ontario P0P 1H0
Phone: 705-282-2262
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2 Water Street
Kirkland & District Family Health Team
Kirkland Lake ON P2N 3M6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Dec 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Zealand

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. K. Bali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Jul 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMARDEEP KAUR BALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMARDEEP KAUR BALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad Iberoamericana(UNIBE), 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Apr 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 14 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 14 Nov 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010