THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:52:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: China Medical University, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-737-7600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Microbiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Microbiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: China Medical University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-737-7600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Microbiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Microbiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YANG YU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YANG YU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: China Medical University, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jul 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 Apr 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Apr 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Mar 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Mar 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010