THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:01:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Toronto Public Health
662 Jane Street
Toronto Ontario M6N 4A7
Phone: (416) 3387270
Fax: (416) 3387033

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. M. O'Mara Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Jan 2025

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Toronto Public Health
662 Jane Street
Toronto Ontario M6N 4A7
Phone: (416) 3387270
Fax: (416) 3387033

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. M. O'Mara Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Jan 2025

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEGHAN MARIE O'MARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'MARA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEGHAN MARIE O'MARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'MARA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010