THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:22:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Humber River Hospital
Medical Affairs Office
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 1K3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Susan Tory Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Sep 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Humber River Hospital
Medical Affairs Office
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 1K3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Susan Tory Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Sep 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSAN KATHLEEN TORY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TORY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSAN KATHLEEN TORY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TORY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 May 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 May 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010