THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 02:57:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ruth and Bruce Rappaport Faculty of Medicine, Technion Israel Institute of Technology, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: CardioMatters Diagnostics
11-14 398 Steeles Ave W
Thornhill Ontario L4J 6X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: CardioMatters Diagnostics
6633 York Regional Rd 7
Markham Ontario L3P 7P2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2075 Hadwen Rd
Mississauga ON L5K 2L3
Phone: 9058551860
Fax: No Information Available
Address: CardioMatters Diagnostics
658 Danforth Ave
Toronto Ontario M4J 5B9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 17 Dec 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, HEBREW
Medical School: Ruth and Bruce Rappaport Faculty of Medicine, Technion Israel Institute of Technology, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: CardioMatters Diagnostics
11-14 398 Steeles Ave W
Thornhill Ontario L4J 6X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: CardioMatters Diagnostics
6633 York Regional Rd 7
Markham Ontario L3P 7P2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2075 Hadwen Rd
Mississauga ON L5K 2L3
Phone: 9058551860
Fax: No Information Available
Address: CardioMatters Diagnostics
658 Danforth Ave
Toronto Ontario M4J 5B9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 17 Dec 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAWFIQ ZEIDAN SHWIRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZEIDAN SHWIRI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAWFIQ ZEIDAN SHWIRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZEIDAN SHWIRI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ruth and Bruce Rappaport Faculty of Medicine, Technion Israel Institute of Technology, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Mar 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Sep 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010