THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 04:43:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ruth and Bruce Rappaport Faculty of Medicine, Technion Israel Institute of Technology, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Hamilton Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-905-521-2100
Extension: 75020
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 121 king street west
Toronto Ontario M5H 3T9
Phone: 1-416-800-0800
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
McMaster Children's Hospital Division of Pediatric Critical Care Hamilton
HOSPITAL: McMaster Children's Hospital Division of Pediatric Critical Care
LOCATION: Hamilton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Ruth and Bruce Rappaport Faculty of Medicine, Technion Israel Institute of Technology, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Hamilton Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-905-521-2100
Extension: 75020
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 121 king street west
Toronto Ontario M5H 3T9
Phone: 1-416-800-0800
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
McMaster Children's Hospital Division of Pediatric Critical Care Hamilton
HOSPITAL: McMaster Children's Hospital Division of Pediatric Critical Care
LOCATION: Hamilton

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JESSICA GANTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANTZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JESSICA GANTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANTZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ruth and Bruce Rappaport Faculty of Medicine, Technion Israel Institute of Technology, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 May 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 May 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010