THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/04/25 00:36:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-813-0211
Fax: 289-529-0251

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-813-0211
Fax: 289-529-0251

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALAN DAVID BERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALAN DAVID BERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 2018
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 May 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010