THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:35:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: Pus, Jacqueline Gail (Used Until: 16 Apr 2014)
Medical School: Queen's University, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 157 Yonge St
Toronto ON
M5C 1X7
Toronto Ontario M5C 1X7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 362 8822
Fax: 416 362 8877

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Skeldon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Dec 2024

General Information

Former Name: Pus, Jacqueline Gail (Used Until: 16 Apr 2014)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 157 Yonge St
Toronto ON
M5C 1X7
Toronto Ontario M5C 1X7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 362 8822
Fax: 416 362 8877

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Skeldon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Dec 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACQUELINE GAIL SKELDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SKELDON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACQUELINE GAIL SKELDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SKELDON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Apr 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010