THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:06:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 108-260 Boulevard Saint-Raymond
Gatineau Québec J9A 3G7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8192002474
Fax: 8192018021
Address: 108-260 Boul Saint-Raymond
office 108c
Gatineau QC J9A 3G7
Phone: 8192002474
Fax: 8192018021
Address: Carlington Community Health Center
900 Merivale rd
Ottawa Ontario K1Z5Z8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 108-260 Boulevard Saint-Raymond
Gatineau Québec J9A 3G7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8192002474
Fax: 8192018021
Address: 108-260 Boul Saint-Raymond
office 108c
Gatineau QC J9A 3G7
Phone: 8192002474
Fax: 8192018021
Address: Carlington Community Health Center
900 Merivale rd
Ottawa Ontario K1Z5Z8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FREDERIC SFEIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SFEIR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FREDERIC SFEIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SFEIR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Dec 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jan 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010