THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:16:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Scarborough Health Network
Emergency Department
3050 Lawrence Ave. E.
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital - Markham Site
Department of Emergency Medicine
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Phone: 905-472-7373
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 23 Nov 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Oak Valley Health Markham
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Scarborough Health Network
Emergency Department
3050 Lawrence Ave. E.
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital - Markham Site
Department of Emergency Medicine
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Phone: 905-472-7373
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 23 Nov 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Oak Valley Health Markham
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROLINE LEE-KWAN CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROLINE LEE-KWAN CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 May 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 May 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010