THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/04/25 01:07:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2005
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
McMaster University
AVP - Neurology
01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
DATE: 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: AVP - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010