THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:36:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: Hosseini-Tabatabaei, Mehr-Afarin (Used Until: 01 Nov 2017)
Medical School: Upstate Medical Center State Univ of N Y, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 151 Harbord Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1H1
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (416) 662-0865
Fax: No Information Available
Address: CCVT
c/o Inner City Health Associates
59 Adelaide St. E, 2nd Floor
Toronto Ontario M5C 1K6
Phone: 416 591 4411
Fax: 416 640 2072

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: Hosseini-Tabatabaei, Mehr-Afarin (Used Until: 01 Nov 2017)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Upstate Medical Center State Univ of N Y, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 151 Harbord Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1H1
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (416) 662-0865
Fax: No Information Available
Address: CCVT
c/o Inner City Health Associates
59 Adelaide St. E, 2nd Floor
Toronto Ontario M5C 1K6
Phone: 416 591 4411
Fax: 416 640 2072

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEHR-AFARIN KOHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEHR-AFARIN KOHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Upstate Medical Center State Univ of N Y, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Sep 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010