THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/04/25 18:52:01 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Faisal University, College of Medicine in Al-Ahsa, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Faisal University, College of Medicine in Al-Ahsa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Faisal University, College of Medicine in Al-Ahsa, 2006
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
10 Feb 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology
01 Jul 2013 to 09 Feb 2014
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology
01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology
01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
University of Toronto
EL - Internal Medicine
26 Sep 2011 to 02 Nov 2011
University of Toronto
EL - Nephrology
05 Jul 2010 to 13 Aug 2010
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
DATE: 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
DATE: 10 Feb 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology
DATE: 01 Jul 2013 to 09 Feb 2014
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology
DATE: 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology
DATE: 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Internal Medicine
DATE: 26 Sep 2011 to 02 Nov 2011
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Nephrology
DATE: 05 Jul 2010 to 13 Aug 2010
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 02 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Aug 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 02 Nov 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2010