THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:48:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Howard University, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 University Avenue
The Hospital for Sick Children
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1755 Brimley Road
OneCareMedical
Toronto Ontario M1P 0A3
Phone: 416-290-0361
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1025 Queen St W
CAMH - Nicotine Dependence Clinic
Addiction Division/ Addiction Medicine Service
Toronto ON M6J 1H4
Phone: 416-535-8501
Extension: 77400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Adolescent Medicine
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 13 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Adolescent Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T. Tulloch Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Mar 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Howard University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 University Avenue
The Hospital for Sick Children
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1755 Brimley Road
OneCareMedical
Toronto Ontario M1P 0A3
Phone: 416-290-0361
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1025 Queen St W
CAMH - Nicotine Dependence Clinic
Addiction Division/ Addiction Medicine Service
Toronto ON M6J 1H4
Phone: 416-535-8501
Extension: 77400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Adolescent Medicine
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 13 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Adolescent Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T. Tulloch Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Mar 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TRISHA DEE-ANN TULLOCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TULLOCH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TRISHA DEE-ANN TULLOCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TULLOCH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Howard University, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2024
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 08 Aug 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Mar 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Mar 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Nov 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Nov 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010