THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:30:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 207
564 Belmont Ave West
Kitchener Ontario N2M5N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5195766410
Fax: 5195769271
Address: 700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge Ontario N1R3G2
Phone: 5196212330
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 911 Queen’s Boulevard
ST MARYS GENERAL HOSPITAL
CARDIOLOGY
KITCHENER ON N2M 1B2
Phone: 519-744-3311
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 16 Nov 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Palmerston & District Site North Wellington Health Care Corp Palmerston
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
Groves Memorial Community Hospital Fergus
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Palmerston & District Site North Wellington Health Care Corp
LOCATION: Palmerston

HOSPITAL: Listowel Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Listowel

HOSPITAL: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
LOCATION: Fergus

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 207
564 Belmont Ave West
Kitchener Ontario N2M5N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5195766410
Fax: 5195769271
Address: 700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge Ontario N1R3G2
Phone: 5196212330
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 911 Queen’s Boulevard
ST MARYS GENERAL HOSPITAL
CARDIOLOGY
KITCHENER ON N2M 1B2
Phone: 519-744-3311
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 16 Nov 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Palmerston & District Site North Wellington Health Care Corp Palmerston
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
Groves Memorial Community Hospital Fergus
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Palmerston & District Site North Wellington Health Care Corp
LOCATION: Palmerston

HOSPITAL: Listowel Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Listowel

HOSPITAL: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
LOCATION: Fergus

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHARD ALEXANDER MATIASZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATIASZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHARD ALEXANDER MATIASZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATIASZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Oct 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010