THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:08:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4019-300 Prince Philip Dr
Health Sciences Centre
Division of Cardiac Surgery
St. John's NL A1B 3X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4019-300 Prince Philip Dr
Health Sciences Centre
Division of Cardiac Surgery
St. John's NL A1B 3X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HASIB MOHAMMED HANIF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANIF is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HASIB MOHAMMED HANIF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANIF is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Oct 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2010