THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:06:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Charles Univ Prague Fac General Medicine, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CZECH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 Abenaki Road
Truro Nova Scotia B2N 5A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 902 893 5526
Fax: 902 893 5551

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 10 Nov 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 10 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CZECH
Medical School: Charles Univ Prague Fac General Medicine, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 Abenaki Road
Truro Nova Scotia B2N 5A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 902 893 5526
Fax: 902 893 5551

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 10 Nov 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 10 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARTINA RUZICKOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUZICKOVA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARTINA RUZICKOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUZICKOVA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Charles Univ Prague Fac General Medicine, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Oct 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Dec 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Oct 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2010