THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 19:39:31 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1988
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Scott & White Drive
College Station Texas 77845
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 304-382-7021
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10050 SW Innovation Way Ste 101
Department of Neurology, Cleveland Clinic
Port Saint Lucie FL United States 34987-2117
Phone: 304-382-7021
Extension: 999
Fax: 9999999999

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 16 Aug 2010
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida
USA - Georgia
USA - Mississippi
USA - Washington
USA - West Virginia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Samina Kazmi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Jan 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Scott & White Drive
College Station Texas 77845
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 304-382-7021
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10050 SW Innovation Way Ste 101
Department of Neurology, Cleveland Clinic
Port Saint Lucie FL United States 34987-2117
Phone: 304-382-7021
Extension: 999
Fax: 9999999999

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 16 Aug 2010
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida
USA - Georgia
USA - Mississippi
USA - Washington
USA - West Virginia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Samina Kazmi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Jan 2022

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
15 Dec 2011
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 15 2011
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Samina Kazmi may practise medicine independently in neurology, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Samina Kazmi may practise medicine independently in neurology, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Karachi, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 15 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Dec 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2010
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2011

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2010