THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:07:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 19 Oct 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. M. Gagnier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Nov 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 19 Oct 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. M. Gagnier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Nov 2018

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 23 Apr 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Aug 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2010
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 23 Apr 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2010