THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 04:27:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Room GSE-140
North York Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Fax: (647) 499-8218

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eneko Arhanchiague Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Arhanchiague (CPSO#: 94351 )
Business Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Room GSE-140
North York Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Room GSE-140
North York Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Fax: (647) 499-8218

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eneko Arhanchiague Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Arhanchiague (CPSO#: 94351 )
Business Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Room GSE-140
North York Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ENEKO RHEAL ARHANCHIAGUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARHANCHIAGUE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ENEKO RHEAL ARHANCHIAGUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARHANCHIAGUE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Sep 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2010