THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:03:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Institute Medicine, Pharmacy, Bucharest, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kipling Heights Medical Centre
2291 Kipling Avenue
Rexdale Ontario M9W 4L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 741-4545
Extension: 226
Fax: (416) 744-1484

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 May 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 23 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN
Medical School: Institute Medicine, Pharmacy, Bucharest, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kipling Heights Medical Centre
2291 Kipling Avenue
Rexdale Ontario M9W 4L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 741-4545
Extension: 226
Fax: (416) 744-1484

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 May 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 23 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IRINA LILIANA IORDACHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IORDACHE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IRINA LILIANA IORDACHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IORDACHE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Institute Medicine, Pharmacy, Bucharest, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2010
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2010