THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:36:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Jawaharlal Nehru Medical College, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, SWAHILI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 19-9699 Jane St
Al Shafa Medical Centre
Maple ON L6A 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 553-2144
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M.Hassan Meghji Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Meghji (CPSO#: 94418 )
Business Address: 20A-9699 Jane St
Maple ON L6A 0A4
4162700761

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, SWAHILI, URDU
Medical School: Jawaharlal Nehru Medical College, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 19-9699 Jane St
Al Shafa Medical Centre
Maple ON L6A 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 553-2144
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M.Hassan Meghji Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Meghji (CPSO#: 94418 )
Business Address: 20A-9699 Jane St
Maple ON L6A 0A4
4162700761

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMED HASSAN MEGHJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEGHJI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMED HASSAN MEGHJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEGHJI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Jawaharlal Nehru Medical College, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2010
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2010