THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:34:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100-405 Fort Whyte Way
Oak Bluff MB R4G 0B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2045602272
Fax: 2048155755

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100-405 Fort Whyte Way
Oak Bluff MB R4G 0B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2045602272
Fax: 2048155755

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AL WALID HAMAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AL WALID HAMAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 Nov 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Nov 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 Nov 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2010