THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 03:57:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1982
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster Hospital
1200 Main Street west
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 73624
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sarab Mohamed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Dec 2015

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster Hospital
1200 Main Street west
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 73624
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sarab Mohamed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Dec 2015

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAB HAMEED MOHAMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMED is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAB HAMEED MOHAMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMED is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Mar 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2010