THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:26:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sally Talbot-Jones Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Sep 2014

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sally Talbot-Jones Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Sep 2014

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Apr 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 Dec 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 28 May 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Oct 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2010
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 28 May 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Feb 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Feb 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2010