THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:21:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3950 Dougall Ave
Windsor Ontario N9G 1X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 974-0660
Fax: 5199150282
Address: 186 Talbot St. S
Essex Ontario N8M 1B6
Phone: (519) 776-1559
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 15 Mill St. E
Tilbury Ontario N0P 2L0
Phone: 519-682-3699
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3840 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9E 3N9
Phone: (519) 972-3944
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 13278 Tecumseh Rd. E
Windsor Ontario N8N 3T6
Phone: (519) 979-5260
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Nov 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nikolaos Koutelas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Jun 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3950 Dougall Ave
Windsor Ontario N9G 1X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 974-0660
Fax: 5199150282
Address: 186 Talbot St. S
Essex Ontario N8M 1B6
Phone: (519) 776-1559
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 15 Mill St. E
Tilbury Ontario N0P 2L0
Phone: 519-682-3699
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3840 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9E 3N9
Phone: (519) 972-3944
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 13278 Tecumseh Rd. E
Windsor Ontario N8N 3T6
Phone: (519) 979-5260
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Nov 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nikolaos Koutelas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Jun 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIKOLAOS KOUTELAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOUTELAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIKOLAOS KOUTELAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOUTELAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Oct 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Dec 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2010