THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 03:30:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Colombo, 1985
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SINHALESE, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1476 Aldersbrook Road
London
London Ontario N6G 0P5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 474-7300
Fax: (519) 474-7309
Address: 395 carrie street
Strathroy General hospital
Strathroy Ontario N6G 3J4
Phone: (519) 245-1550
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jan 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 04 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SINHALESE, TAMIL
Medical School: University of Colombo, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1476 Aldersbrook Road
London
London Ontario N6G 0P5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 474-7300
Fax: (519) 474-7309
Address: 395 carrie street
Strathroy General hospital
Strathroy Ontario N6G 3J4
Phone: (519) 245-1550
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jan 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 04 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PADUMANITHI GUNASINGAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUNASINGAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PADUMANITHI GUNASINGAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUNASINGAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Colombo, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Nov 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2010