THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:08:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Delhi, 1987
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ansley Grove Medical Centre
Unit 9
110 Ansley Grove Road
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 3R1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-605-8444
Fax: 905-605-2520

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jacqueline Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: University of Delhi, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ansley Grove Medical Centre
Unit 9
110 Ansley Grove Road
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 3R1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-605-8444
Fax: 905-605-2520

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jacqueline Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACQUELINE PARIAT GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACQUELINE PARIAT GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Delhi, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Oct 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2010