THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 03:42:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 523 Algoma Street North
Matawa Training & Wellness Centre
Matawa Health Co-Operative
Thunder Bay Ontario P7A 5C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 807-346-2370
Fax: 807-345-2371

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 May 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Geraldton District Hospital
LOCATION: Geraldton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jonathan Koo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Aug 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 523 Algoma Street North
Matawa Training & Wellness Centre
Matawa Health Co-Operative
Thunder Bay Ontario P7A 5C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 807-346-2370
Fax: 807-345-2371

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 May 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Geraldton District Hospital
LOCATION: Geraldton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jonathan Koo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Aug 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHAN JESSE KOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHAN JESSE KOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Aug 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2010