THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:03:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Valladolid, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Valladolid, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Valladolid, 1990
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Neurology
23 Feb 2011 to 03 Dec 2011
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Neurology
01 Dec 2010 to 22 Feb 2011
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurology
DATE: 23 Feb 2011 to 03 Dec 2011
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Neurology
DATE: 01 Dec 2010 to 22 Feb 2011
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 Dec 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2010
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 Dec 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Feb 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Dec 2010