THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:03:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 206
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 741-5252
Extension: 222
Fax: (519) 741-5772

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 16 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Almanfud Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 206
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 741-5252
Extension: 222
Fax: (519) 741-5772

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 16 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Almanfud Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDULLAH A A ALMANFUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALMANFUD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDULLAH A A ALMANFUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALMANFUD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2011
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jan 2011