THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 04:41:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of California, San Diego, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Feb 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 14 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: University of California, San Diego, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Feb 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 14 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
31 Jul 2014
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 31 2014
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Toni Jo Canton may practise medicine independently in family
medicine, only.



VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Toni Jo Canton may practise medicine independently in family
medicine, only.



Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of California, San Diego, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Aug 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 31 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Apr 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Feb 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2011
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Feb 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Feb 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Apr 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 May 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 May 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Feb 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Feb 2011